AK SJR13 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-10-09 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE NO. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-10-09 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE NO. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act
Title
Amend Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-09 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE NO. 29 |
2024-10-09 | Senate | 3:25 P.M. 6/19/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-05-09 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, CRONK, STAPP, JOSEPHSON, MEARS, HANNAN |
2024-05-09 | House | VERSION: SJR 13 |
2024-05-09 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2024-05-09 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2024-05-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 13 |
2024-05-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2024-05-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-05-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(S.CRA) |
2024-03-13 | House | NR: BAKER, MCCABE |
2024-03-13 | House | DP: MEARS, RUFFRIDGE, MCKAY, HIMSCHOOT, MCCORMICK |
2024-03-13 | House | CRA RPT 5DP 2NR |
2024-02-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS, GRAY |
2024-02-15 | House | CRA |
2024-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-02-14 | Senate | VERSION: SJR 13 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 13 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI, KAWASAKI, TOBIN, STEDMAN, STEVENS |
2024-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING NEXT CAL |
2024-02-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-02-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.CRA) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | NR: BJORKMAN |
2024-02-07 | Senate | DP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON |
2024-02-07 | Senate | CRA RPT 2DP 1NR |
2024-02-05 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON |
2024-02-02 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, OLSON |
2024-01-26 | Senate | CRA |
2024-01-26 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska Natives
Corporations
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Municipalities
Native Organizations
Trusts
Unorganized Borough
Corporations
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Municipalities
Native Organizations
Trusts
Unorganized Borough