VA HB476 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Retail Small Business Grant Program and Fund. Establishes the Retail Small Business Grant Program and Fund to support existing Virginia small businesses, attract new businesses, increase the Commonwealth's tax base, create new job opportunities for Virginia residents, and enhance commercial activity in Virginia. The bill provides that an eligible Virginia small business, defined in the bill, is eligible for grants of up to $50,000. The total amount of grants awarded in a fiscal year is capped at $10 million.
Title
Retail Small Business Grant Program and Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103217D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 284.40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 284.41 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 284.42 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |