VA HB467 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Coal ash recycling or reuse. Prohibits disposal of coal combustion residuals except by recycling or beneficial reuse, unless it can be shown by clear and convincing evidence that such recycling or beneficial reuse is not cost-effective compared with another means of disposal. The bill authorizes the Virginia Waste Management Board to adopt regulations to carry out such prohibition.
Title
Coal ash; recycling or reuse.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102571D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB467 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB467+hil |