VA HB460 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Salaries; city council. Raises the maximum salary of city council members by $10,000 for cities with a population of 175,000 or more. Under current law, changes to existing salaries must be approved by the city council, and no increase in the salary of a member of council shall take effect until July 1 after the next regularly scheduled general election of council members.
Title
City council members; raises maximum salary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101689D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB460 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB460+hil |