VA HB422 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms businesses; local regulation; proximity to schools. Authorizes any locality to adopt an ordinance regulating or prohibiting anyone from engaging in the business of selling firearms at retail, providing gunsmithing services, or operating a sports shooting range, within 1,000 feet of a school.
Title
Firearms dealers; local regulation of dealers in proximity of schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101016D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB422 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB422+hil |