VA HB397 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB397
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governing boards of public institutions of higher education; input from faculty senate. Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education to solicit the input of the institution's faculty senate or its equivalent (i) at least twice per academic year and (ii) regarding the search for candidates for the position of chief executive officer of the institution.
Title
Higher education institutions, public; governing boards, input from faculty senate.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104083D |
Same As/Similar To
HB397 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Education by voice vote