VA HB397 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - House: Tabled in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - House: Tabled in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Parole Board; exceptions to the Freedom of Information Act. Requires guidance documents of the Board to be available as public records under the Freedom of Information Act. The bill has a delayed effective date to give the Freedom of Information Advisory Council an opportunity to review the legislation and report on its implementation.
Title
Parole Board; exceptions to Freedom of Information Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | House: Tabled in General Laws by voice vote | |
2012-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103531D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB397 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB397+hil |