VA HB380 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (voter referendum); apportionment; Virginia Redistricting Commission. Provides for a referendum at the November 3, 2020, election to approve or reject amendments to the Constitution of Virginia establishing the Virginia Redistricting Commission and providing for the reapportionment of the Commonwealth to be done by such Commission. If approved by the voters, the amendments would become effective on November 15, 2020.
Title
Constitutional amendment; apportionment, Virginia Redistricting Commission (voter referendum).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Redistricting |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100229D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB380 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB380+hil |