VA HB371 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
COPN exception; establishment of a psychiatric service. Provides that the Commissioner shall accept and review applications in any certificate of public need Batch Group G review cycle and may issue certificates of public need for the establishment of psychiatric services resulting from a relocation of psychiatric beds from one hospital in Planning District 5 to another hospital in Planning District 5. This bill also provides that no psychiatric beds relocated from one hospital to another hospital in Planning District 5 pursuant to such certificate of public need shall be converted to any other use than inpatient psychiatric care. This bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Certificate of public need; establishment of psychiatric services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 4/11/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB371ER) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Emergency clause added | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB371H1 | |
2010-01-21 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104063D-H1 | |
2010-01-21 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-20 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104063D-H1 | |
2010-01-19 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102179D |