VA HB361 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regional jails; disposition of fees for prisoners' keep. Allows regional jails to retain fees collected for prisoners' keep instead of crediting those fees to the locality that incarcerated the inmate.
Title
Regional jails; disposition of fees for prisoners' keep.
Sponsors
Del. Onzlee Ware [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB361ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102725D |