VA HB351 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; tuition and room and board; enrollment. Requires, for the next four academic years, the tuition charged to Virginia students at each public institution of higher education to be capped at the rate charged to such students for the first academic term of the 2017-2018 academic year. The bill permits, during such four-year period, the room and board charged to such students to be increased on an annual basis in advance of the first academic term of the academic year, but requires the percentage of such increase to be capped at 90 percent of the annual percentage increase in the Average Consumer Price Index for all items, all urban consumers (CPI-U) for the preceding calendar year. The bill also requires, for the next four academic years, the percentage of non-Virginia students enrolled at each public institution of higher education to be capped at the percentage of such students enrolled for the first academic term of the 2017-2018 academic year and does not prohibit an increase in the tuition or room and board charged to such students during such four-year period.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; tuition and room and board, enrollment.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Jason Miyares [R] |
Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101478D |