VA HB342 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia State Police communication system. Virginia State Police communication system. Removes obsolete language relating to the teletype system formerly used by the Virginia State Police. The bill contains technical amendments. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Police, Virginia State; removes obsolete language relating to the teletype system formerly used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 49 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB342ER) |
2022-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-21 | House | Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101115D |