VA HB336 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees; bargaining representative certification. Provides that, in a locality that has authorized collective bargaining by ordinance or resolution, a bargaining representative must be selected for each collective bargaining unit determined to be appropriate by the governing body of the locality. The bill provides that for a bargaining representative to be certified as an exclusive representative, at least 51 percent of the public employees in a collective bargaining unit must vote for certification of the bargaining representative through a secret ballot election conducted by the governing body of the locality, and a secret ballot election shall be conducted very two years to confirm majority support for the bargaining representative. Preexisting bargaining representatives must also be certified by a vote of at least 51 percent of the affected collective bargaining unit. Public employees; bargaining representative certification. Provides that, in a locality that has authorized collective bargaining by ordinance or resolution, a bargaining representative must be selected for each collective bargaining unit determined to be appropriate by the governing body of the locality. The bill provides that for a bargaining representative to be certified as an exclusive representative, at least 51 percent of the public employees in a collective bargaining unit must vote for certification of the bargaining representative through a secret ballot election conducted by the governing body of the locality, and a secret ballot election shall be conducted very two years to confirm majority support for the bargaining representative. Preexisting bargaining representatives must also be certified by a vote of at least 51 percent of the affected collective bargaining unit.
Title
Public employees; bargaining representative certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB336H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22104716D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22104716D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100096D |