VA HB3 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax exemption; gold, silver, and platinum Sales tax exemption; gold, silver, and platinum bullion. Extends the sunset date for the sales tax exemption for gold, silver, and platinum bullion and legal tender coins whose sales price exceeds $1,000 to June 30, 2025. Under current law, the exemption will expire on June 30, 2022.
Title
Gold, silver, and platinum bullion, etc.; extends sunset date for the sales tax exemption.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (84-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012) | |
2022-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on FEbruary 24, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB3ER) |
2022-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-21 | House | VOTE: Adoption (84-Y 14-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (84-Y 14-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 22100636D-E |
2022-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB3E |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-19 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (19-Y 2-N) |
2021-11-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-11-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100636D |