VA HB298 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Machinery and tools tax; car washing businesses. Classifies machinery and tools used to clean motor vehicles by a motor vehicle cleaning business as a separate class of property for tax rate purposes.
Title
Machinery and tools tax; classifies car washing businesses as separate class of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0267) | |
2012-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 267 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-28 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB298ER) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100037D |