VA HB284 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0118)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0118)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real Estate Appraiser Board; continuing education to include fair housing or appraisal bias courses. Provides that any regulation of the Real Estate Appraiser Board setting out continuing education requirements for real estate appraiser licensees as a prerequisite of license renewal shall include at least two hours of fair housing or appraisal bias courses if the Board requires continuing education for the renewal of such licenses. The bill directs the Real Estate Appraiser Board to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of this act that include a course of at least two hours relating to fair housing or appraisal bias and exempts the initial adoption of such regulations from the Administrative Process Act, except that the Board shall provide an opportunity for public comment prior to adoption of the regulations. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2023. Real Estate Appraiser Board; continuing education to include fair housing or appraisal bias courses. Provides that any regulation of the Real Estate Appraiser Board setting out continuing education requirements for real estate appraiser licensees as a prerequisite of license renewal shall include at least two hours of fair housing or appraisal bias courses if the Board requires continuing education for the renewal of such licenses. The bill directs the Real Estate Appraiser Board to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of this act that include a course of at least two hours relating to fair housing or appraisal bias and exempts the initial adoption of such regulations from the Administrative Process Act, except that the Board shall provide an opportunity for public comment prior to adoption of the regulations. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2023.
Title
Real Estate Appraiser Board; continuing education to include fair housing or appraisal bias courses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0118) | |
2022-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 118 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB284ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106968D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB284S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106968D-S1 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106968D-S1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104242D |