VA HB2796 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Watercraft; transfer by operation of law; transfer on death. States that a watercraft may be transferred by operation of law through the execution of a statement of transfer on death.
Title
Watercraft; transfer by operation of law, transfer on death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 236 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2796ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2796H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105444D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105444D-H1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19105290D |