VA HB256 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Tabled in Education (13-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Tabled in Education (13-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Program; eligible institutions; contracts. Permits eligible institutions under the New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Program to contract with noncredit workforce training programs and providers, provided that the instructors of such programs and providers are certified and are compensated by the eligible institution.
Title
New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Program; eligible institutions, contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House: Tabled in Education (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Tabled in Education (13-Y 9-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102719D |