VA HB2549 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cluster zoning; density calculation. Prohibits localities from including areas designated as Resource Protection Areas in accordance with the State Water Control Board in a cluster zoning density calculation and provides that nothing in the statute shall require a locality to allow a greater overall density for a clustered development than would be required on a non-clustered development.
Title
Cluster zoning; density calculation.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2019-02-24 | House | No further action taken |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (10-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19104091D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2549E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104091D |