VA HB2527 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tolling; Planning District 8. Prohibits the imposition and collection of tolls on any primary highway that is wholly located in Planning District 8 and that was previously classified as a secondary highway and is between 30 and 35 miles in length without prior approval by the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tolling; prohibited in Northern Virginia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0548)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 548 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2527ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (88-Y 9-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19102826D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2527E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102826D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332119(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2527
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2527+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2527E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2527ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0548+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1902V0016+HB2527
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0041+HB2527
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2197+HB2527
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0146+HB2527
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2527+HB2527
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2527+HB2527

Bill Comments

feedback