VA HB252 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; school division maintenance reserve tool. Requires the Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of General Services, to develop or adopt and maintain a data collection tool to assist each school board to determine the relative age of each public school building in the local school division and the amount of maintenance reserve funds that are necessary to restore each such building. The bill requires each school board to provide to the Department of Education in a timely fashion the local data that is necessary to ensure that such tool remains relevant and useful for the determination of maintenance reserve needs. The bill requires the Department of Education to consider converting or using as a template the Department of General Services' M-R FIX tool to meet the above requirement to maintain such a tool. This bill is a recommendation of the Commission on School Construction and Modernization.
Title
School division maintenance reserve tool; Department of Education to develop or adopt and maintain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103899D |