VA HB2470 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prostitution and human trafficking related crimes; minors; penalty. Increases from a Class 3 felony to a Class 2 felony and imposes a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment of 25 years for the following crimes if minors under 15 years of age are involved: (i) pandering; (ii) receiving money for procuring a person for the purpose of prostitution, forced labor, or child pornography; (iii) receiving money from the earnings of a person engaged in prostitution; and (iv) commercial sex trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minors; prostitution and human trafficking related crimes, increases penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24HouseFailed to pass in House
2019-02-24HouseNo further action taken
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Obenshain, Stuart, Howell
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Ransone, Herring
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (92-Y 4-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2470H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105990D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105990D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 4-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102660D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182355(n/a)See Bill Text
182356(n/a)See Bill Text
182357(n/a)See Bill Text
182357.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2470
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2470+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2470H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0121+HB2470
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0115+HB2470
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2479+HB2470
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0248+HB2470
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0377+HB2470
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2470+HB2470
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2470+HB2470
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3219+HB2470
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0979HB2470+HB2470

Bill Comments

feedback