VA HB2464 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Petersburg. Updates and reorganizes the city's charter. Obsolete provisions are either repealed or updated, and numerous technical amendments are made. This bill is identical to SB 1580.
Title
Petersburg, City of; amending charter, repeals or updates obsolete provisions, technical amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0733) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 733 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2464ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103662D |