VA HB246 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited conduct; Governor and Attorney General; parties to litigation with the state; penalties. Prohibits acceptance by the Governor or Attorney General of campaign contributions or gifts worth more than $50 from parties who oppose the state in ongoing litigation and prohibits making such contributions and gifts. The bill imposes civil penalties.
Title
Governor and Attorney General; parties to litigation with state, prohibited conduct, penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2013-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100203D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 450.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3104.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB246 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB246+hil |