VA HB2455 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal utility services; notice of adverse judgment. Provides that when a court decision is entered against a locality holding that the locality has overcharged for utility services it provides, the locality must give notice of the decision to all users of such services who are potentially affected by the decision.
Title
Municipal utility services; notice of adverse judgment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-26 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103718D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2455 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2455+hil |