VA HB241 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - House: Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - House: Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Solid waste landfill; Rockbridge County. Allows the Rockbridge County landfill to operate for an additional two years or until it reaches maximum capacity, whichever occurs sooner. The landfill is scheduled to be closed by the Department of Environmental Quality on December 31, 2012.
Title
Solid waste landfill; allows Rockbridge County to operate for an additional two years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | House: Stricken from docket by Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103382D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB241 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB241+hil |