VA HB236 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; authority to temporarily extend certain teachers' licenses; emergency. Permits the Board of Education to grant a two-year extension of the license of any individual licensed by the Board of Education pursuant to its statutory authority whose license expires on June 30, 2022, in order to provide the individual with sufficient additional time to complete the requirements for licensure or license renewal. The bill contains an emergency clause. Board of Education; authority to temporarily extend certain teachers' licenses; emergency. Permits the Board of Education to grant a two-year extension of the license of any individual licensed by the Board of Education pursuant to its statutory authority whose license expires on June 30, 2022, in order to provide the individual with sufficient additional time to complete the requirements for licensure or license renewal. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Teachers' licenses, certain; Board of Education permitted to temporarily extend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104) | |
2022-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 104 (effective 4/6/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB236ER) |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | Emergency clause added |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 22100993D-E |
2022-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB236E |
2022-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100993D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Education
Emergency Legislation
Teachers
Uncodified Legislation
Education
Emergency Legislation
Teachers
Uncodified Legislation