VA HB2306 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) savings trust accounts established; administered by the Virginia College Savings Plan. Establishes ABLE savings trust accounts to be administered by the Virginia College Savings Plan to facilitate the saving of private funds for paying the qualified disability expenses of certain disabled individuals. Under the federal Achieving a Better Life Experience Act of 2014, Congress authorized states to establish ABLE savings trust accounts to assist individuals and families in saving and paying for the education, housing, transportation, employment training and support, assistive technology and personal support services, health, prevention and wellness, financial management and administrative services, and other expenses of individuals who were disabled or blind prior to the age of 26. Earnings on contributions to ABLE savings trust accounts are exempt from federal income tax. Because Virginia conforms to the federal income tax laws, earnings on contributions to ABLE savings trust accounts will also be excluded from Virginia taxable income.
Title
ABLE savings trust accounts; established, administered by the Virginia College Savings Plan.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N) (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N) (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective - 7/1/15 see bill) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2306ER) |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-18 | House | Delegates: Filler-Corn, Jones, Massie |
2015-02-18 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senators: Stosch, Martin, Howell |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-18 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105184D-S1 (0-Y 95-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2306S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105184D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105184D-S1 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 15-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2306H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Substitute by Delegate Ware agreed to 15104956D-H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendment rejected |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendment reconsidered |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15104527D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute reconsidered |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104527D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104956D-H2 (Ware) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104527D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103326D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1404 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)