VA HB2291 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2291
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement civilian oversight bodies; deputy sheriffs. Adds a sheriff's office to those law-enforcement agencies that may be overseen by a law-enforcement civilian oversight body created by a locality and adds a nonprobationary deputy sheriff of a sheriff’s office to those law-enforcement officers who are subject to such body if created by a locality. The bill provides that any disciplinary determinations made by the law-enforcement civilian oversight body on any nonprobationary deputy sheriff shall be advisory only and that if the sheriff's office declines to implement such disciplinary determination, the office shall create a public written record of its rationale for declining to implement the recommended disciplinary determination. Law-enforcement civilian oversight bodies; deputy sheriffs. Adds a sheriff's office to those law-enforcement agencies that may be overseen by a law-enforcement civilian oversight body created by a locality and adds a nonprobationary deputy sheriff of a sheriff’s office to those law-enforcement officers who are subject to such body if created by a locality. The bill provides that any disciplinary determinations made by the law-enforcement civilian oversight body on any nonprobationary deputy sheriff shall be advisory only and that if the sheriff's office declines to implement such disciplinary determination, the office shall create a public written record of its rationale for declining to implement the recommended disciplinary determination.
Title
Law-enforcement civilian oversight bodies; deputy sheriffs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 46-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101778D-E |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2291E |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Public Safety with amendment(s) (12-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21101778D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2291 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)