VA HB229 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive Services for At-Risk Youth and Families; special education programs. Expands eligibility for services through the Comprehensive Services for At-Risk Youth and Families program to students placed in public school special educational programs established by a school division for the purpose of providing special education when the public school special educational program is able to provide services comparable to those of an approved private school special educational program, and the student would require placement in an approved private school special educational program but for the availability of the public school special educational program.
Title
Comprehensive Services for At-Risk Youth and Families; special education programs.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104518D-H1 |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2013-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101766D |