VA HB2273 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enterprise Zone Grant Program; redesignation of certain joint enterprise zones. Provides that when a county or city was previously added to an existing enterprise zone to create a joint enterprise zone, the Department of Housing and Community Development shall redesignate the enterprise zone when the term of the joint enterprise zone expires. The redesignated enterprise zone's duration shall be equal to the length of time the original enterprise zone existed before the county or city was added to create the joint enterprise zone.
Title
Enterprise Zone Grant Program; redesignation of certain joint enterprise zones.
Sponsors
Del. George Loupassi [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] | Del. John O'Bannon [R] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Peter Farrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514) | |
2013-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2273ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 24-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 13105081D-S1 (75-Y 24-N) |
2013-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2273S1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105081D-S1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105081D-S1 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 9-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13102652D |