VA HB2229 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2229
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; responsibilities of real estate brokers; foreclosure of single-family residential dwelling units. Provides that if a dwelling unit used as a single-family residence is foreclosed upon and there is a tenant in such dwelling unit on the date of the foreclosure sale, if the successor in interest acquires the dwelling unit for the purpose of occupying such unit as his primary residence, the rental agreement terminates and the tenant is required to vacate the dwelling unit on a date not less than 90 days after receiving written notice. The bill also provides that if the successor in interest acquires the dwelling unit for any other purpose, the successor in interest acquires the dwelling unit subject to the rental agreement and is required to permit the tenant to occupy the dwelling unit for the remaining term of the lease. Under current law, the foreclosure sale acts as a termination of the rental agreement by the owner, but the tenant is permitted to remain in possession of the dwelling unit as a month-to-month tenant on the terms of the terminated rental agreement until the successor owner gives a notice of termination of the month-to-month tenancy. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; responsibilities of real estate brokers, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426) | |
2021-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 426 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2229ER) |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102538D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2229 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2108.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |