VA HB2222 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth's Attorneys Training Fund. Establishes the Commonwealth's Attorneys Training Fund to be used for the purpose of supporting prosecutor training and law-enforcement training.
Title
Commonwealth's Attorneys Training Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2222ER) |
2015-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103583D-E |
2015-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2222E |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103583D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1360 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2619.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 124.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |