VA SB1360 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth's Attorneys Training Fund. Establishes the Commonwealth's Attorneys Training Fund to be used for the purpose of supporting prosecutor training and law-enforcement training.
Title
Commonwealth's Attorneys Training Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 226 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1360ER) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15103706D-E |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1360E |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103706D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2222 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2619.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 124.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |