VA HB2221 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2221
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental permits; community and environmental justice outreach. Requires the applicant for any (i) new or major modified stationary air pollution source, (ii) new landfill or transfer station, (iii) certification of site approval for a hazardous waste facility, (iv) new individual Virginia Pollutant Discharge Elimination System permit, (v) new individual Virginia Water Protection permit, (vi) new individual Virginia Stormwater Management Program permit, (vii) new individual Virginia Pollution Abatement permit, or (viii) individual ground water withdrawal permit for a new ground water withdrawal to complete certain public notice requirements, including (a) holding a public hearing; (b) publishing notices in English and Spanish in a newspaper, on social media, and on signage at the site location at least 60 days prior to such public meeting; (c) mailing notices to interested parties; (d) accepting written comments; (e) transcribing meeting information; and (f) responding to community concerns to the satisfaction of the Department of Environmental Quality. The bill removes an exemption for applicants for a permit to operate a new captive industrial landfill or a new construction-demolition-debris landfill from certain provisions relating to new landfills or transfer stations. The bill also removes an exemption from certain public notice requirements granted to local government or public authority applicants for a permit to operate a landfill or transfer station.
Title
Environmental permits; community and environmental justice outreach.
Sponsors
Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2221H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104396D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104396D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102944D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2221 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1321.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1408.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1437.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 266.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.6:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |