VA HB2221 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2221

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental permits; community and environmental justice outreach. Requires the applicant for any (i) new or major modified stationary air pollution source, (ii) new landfill or transfer station, (iii) certification of site approval for a hazardous waste facility, (iv) new individual Virginia Pollutant Discharge Elimination System permit, (v) new individual Virginia Water Protection permit, (vi) new individual Virginia Stormwater Management Program permit, (vii) new individual Virginia Pollution Abatement permit, or (viii) individual ground water withdrawal permit for a new ground water withdrawal to complete certain public notice requirements, including (a) holding a public hearing; (b) publishing notices in English and Spanish in a newspaper, on social media, and on signage at the site location at least 60 days prior to such public meeting; (c) mailing notices to interested parties; (d) accepting written comments; (e) transcribing meeting information; and (f) responding to community concerns to the satisfaction of the Department of Environmental Quality. The bill removes an exemption for applicants for a permit to operate a new captive industrial landfill or a new construction-demolition-debris landfill from certain provisions relating to new landfills or transfer stations. The bill also removes an exemption from certain public notice requirements granted to local government or public authority applicants for a permit to operate a landfill or transfer station.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental permits; community and environmental justice outreach.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateLeft in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 43-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2221H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104396D-H1
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104396D-H1
2021-02-03HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 8-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102944D

Same As/Similar To

HB2221 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011321.2(n/a)See Bill Text
1011408.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1011437.1(n/a)See Bill Text
621266.1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.6:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2221
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2221+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2221H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/.htm
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200192D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2221F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2221FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0103C0019+HB2221
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01C0053+HB2221
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1504+HB2221
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01C0079+HB2221

Bill Comments

feedback