VA HB2211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Individualized education programs; identification of necessary additional services and referrals. Requires individualized education program teams to identify any children with disabilities who may need additional services outside of the school setting and refer them to the local family assessment and planning team.
Title
Individualized education programs; identification of necessary additional services and referrals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2117-VanValkenburg) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Incorporated by Education |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2117-VanValkenburg) (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101529D |