VA HB2197 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2197

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

DMAS; work group to study options for the permanent use of virtual supports and increasing access to virtual supports and services; individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to study and develop recommendations for the permanent use of virtual supports and increasing access to virtual supports and services for individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities by promoting access to assistive technology and environmental modifications and to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individuals w/ intellectual & developmental disabilities; DMAS to study use of virtual support, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 98-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 223 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2197ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-27HouseVOTE: Agreed To (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-27HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-26 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-24SenateSenators: Suetterlein, Boysko, Spruill
2021-02-24SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-23HouseDelegates: Runion, Hope, Tran
2021-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-02-22SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 98-N)
2021-02-18HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 98-N)
2021-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-16SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-16SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-16SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-16SenateRead third time
2021-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102710D

Same As/Similar To

HB2197 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
SB1472 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
SB1472 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2197
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2197+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2197ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0223+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104408A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2197AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2197ASE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2197AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2197F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2197FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1201C0008+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0053+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1131+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09C0060+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09V0009+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0048HB2197+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0054HB2197+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1735+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0255HB2197+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0523HB2197+HB2197
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV2010+HB2197

Bill Comments 750

feedback