VA SB1472 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1472
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DMAS; work group to study options for the permanent use of virtual supports and increasing access to virtual supports and services; individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to study and develop recommendations for the permanent use of virtual supports and increasing access to virtual supports and services for individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities by promoting access to assistive technology and environmental modifications and to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2021.
Title
Individuals w/ intellectual & developmental disabilities; DMAS to study use of virtual support, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0224) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 224 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1472ER) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Title replaced 21200125D-H1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1472H1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21200125D-H1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 21200125D-H1 |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1472S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21104072D-S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21104072D-S1 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 21101385D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1472 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
HB2197 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
HB2197 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
HB2197 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
HB2197 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0223)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation