VA HB2182 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; definition of "traumatic brain injury." Requires the Board of Education to amend its regulatory definition of "traumatic brain injury," for the purpose of the provision of special education for children with disabilities, to include an acquired injury to the brain caused by a medical condition, including stroke, anoxia, infectious disease, aneurysm, brain tumors, and neurological insults resulting from medical or surgical treatments. The current regulatory definition of "traumatic brain injury" includes only an acquired brain injury caused by an external physical force.
Title
Traumatic brain injury; definition.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101127D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2182 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)