VA HB2182 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2182

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Education; definition of "traumatic brain injury." Requires the Board of Education to amend its regulatory definition of "traumatic brain injury," for the purpose of the provision of special education for children with disabilities, to include an acquired injury to the brain caused by a medical condition, including stroke, anoxia, infectious disease, aneurysm, brain tumors, and neurological insults resulting from medical or surgical treatments. The current regulatory definition of "traumatic brain injury" includes only an acquired brain injury caused by an external physical force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traumatic brain injury; Board of Education to amend regulatory definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2182ER)
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled
2021-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101127D

Same As/Similar To

HB2182 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2182
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2182+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2182ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0170+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2182F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2182FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0901C0069+HB2182
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09C0044+HB2182
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1222+HB2182
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0126+HB2182
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0026+HB2182
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB2182+HB2182
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0020HB2182+HB2182

Bill Comments

feedback