VA HB2147 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Pharmacy; translated directions for use of prescriptions; report. Directs the Board of Pharmacy to convene a work group to study the provision of translated directions for the use of prescriptions. The bill directs the work group to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by December 1, 2023. Board of Pharmacy; translated directions for use of prescriptions; report. Directs the Board of Pharmacy to convene a work group to study the provision of translated directions for the use of prescriptions. The bill directs the work group to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by December 1, 2023.
Title
Prescriptions; Bd. of Pharmacy to evaluate translated directions for use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0630) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 630 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2147ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2147H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105286D-H1 |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105286D-H1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103143D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Prescription Medicines
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Prescription Medicines
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation