VA HB2139 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State officers and employees; removal of certain officers from office. Repeals an archaic provision that provides that the Secretary of the Commonwealth, State Treasurer, Comptroller, Superintendent of Public Instruction, or Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services may be removed from office by joint vote of the two houses of the General Assembly or, during the recess thereof, may be suspended by the Governor. The repealed statute also provides that this power shall not be exercised by the Governor except for misbehavior, incapacity, neglect of official duty, or acts performed without due authority of law and that in any case in which this power is so exercised by the Governor, he shall fill the office by a temporary appointment and report to the General Assembly, at the beginning of the next session thereof, the fact of such suspension and the cause therefor, whereupon the General Assembly shall determine whether such officer shall be restored or finally removed.
Title
State officers and employees; removal of certain officers from office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131) | |
2013-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 131 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2139ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102720D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1104 (Same As) 2013-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)