VA SB1104 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State officers and employees; removal of certain officers from office. Repeals an archaic provision that provides that the Secretary of the Commonwealth, State Treasurer, Comptroller, Superintendent of Public Instruction, or Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services may be removed from office by joint vote of the two houses of the General Assembly or, during the recess thereof, may be suspended by the Governor. The repealed statute also provides that this power shall not be exercised by the Governor except for misbehavior, incapacity, neglect of official duty, or acts performed without due authority of law and that in any case in which this power is so exercised by the Governor, he shall fill the office by a temporary appointment and report to the General Assembly, at the beginning of the next session thereof, the fact of such suspension and the cause therefor, whereupon the General Assembly shall determine whether such officer shall be restored or finally removed.
Title
State officers and employees; removal of certain officers from office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722) | |
2013-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 722 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1104ER) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102453D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2139 (Same As) 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)