VA HB2128 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Custody and visitation agreements; best interests of the child. Requires the court to consider any history of abuse of persons other than family members when determining the best interests of the child for the purposes of custody and visitation arrangements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custody and visitation agreements; best interests of the child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-03 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N) (Y: 10 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-03HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (10-Y 10-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil Law
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102411D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback