VA HB2114 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Motion picture production tax credit; digital interactive media production. Provides that digital interactive media productions will no longer be eligible for motion picture film production tax credits beginning with taxable year 2018.
Title
Motion picture production tax credit; digital interactive media production.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102501D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2114 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2114+hil |