VA HB2083 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Community policy and management teams. Directs community policy and management teams to establish, as part of their policies governing referrals and reviews of children and families to the family assessment and planning teams or a collaborative, multidisciplinary team process approved by the State Executive Council for Comprehensive Services for At-Risk Youth and Families, a process for parents and persons who have primary physical custody of a child to refer children in their care to the teams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community policy and management teams; policies governing referrals and reviews.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 11-N) (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-17 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
2015-03-17 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 305 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
2015-02-26SenateSigned by President
2015-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2083ER)
2015-02-24HouseEnrolled
2015-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 11-N)
2015-02-19HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (89-Y 11-N)
2015-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-17SenatePassed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-17SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-17SenatePassed Senate with amendment (36-Y 0-N)
2015-02-17SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2015-02-17SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2015-02-17SenateReading of amendment waived
2015-02-17SenateRead third time
2015-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-13SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
2015-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2015-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-03HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 10-N)
2015-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (87-Y 10-N)
2015-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 15103233D-E
2015-02-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2083E
2015-02-02HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2015-02-02HouseRead second time
2015-01-30HouseRead first time
2015-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (15-Y 7-N)
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2015-01-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103233D

Same As/Similar To

SB1041 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0088)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225206(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2083
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2083+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2083E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2083ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0305+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H12V0047+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV1840+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S09V0073+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0500HB2083+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0532HB2083+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0542HB2083+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0543HB2083+HB2083
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2546+HB2083

Bill Comments 750

feedback