VA HB2054 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Tabled in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Tabled in Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
High school graduation and dropout data; formula; on-time graduation. Requires the formula that the Board of Education uses to collect, analyze, report, and make available to the public high school graduation and dropout data to exclude any student who fails to graduate on time because of an extenuating circumstance. The bill requires the Board of Education to enumerate qualifying extenuating circumstances by regulation.
Title
High school graduation and dropout data; formula, on-time graduation.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Tabled in Education by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101143D |