VA HB2035 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dissemination of criminal history record information; Department of Medical Assistance Services; screening individuals. Provides that home care organizations, hospices, behavioral health care providers, and community services boards may disclose to the Department of Medical Assistance Services information regarding (i) whether a criminal history background check has been performed on an employee or other person for whom a background check is required and (ii) whether the person is eligible for employment or to provide services.
Title
Criminal history record information; screening individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 89 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2035ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2035H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105610D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105610D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101809D |