VA HB2035 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dissemination of criminal history record information; Department of Medical Assistance Services; screening individuals. Provides that home care organizations, hospices, behavioral health care providers, and community services boards may disclose to the Department of Medical Assistance Services information regarding (i) whether a criminal history background check has been performed on an employee or other person for whom a background check is required and (ii) whether the person is eligible for employment or to provide services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal history record information; screening individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 89 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2035ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2035H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105610D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105610D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101809D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2035
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2035+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2035H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2035ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0089+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1202V0017+HB2035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0068+HB2035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2148+HB2035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2222+HB2035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0215+HB2035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2035+HB2035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2035+HB2035

Bill Comments

feedback